Toromanova v. First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dimitritza H Toromanova
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01482
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens by Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. Responses due by 10/18/2018. (Hightower, Victoria)
October 4, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Hightower, Victoria)
October 1, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Join Parties by Plaintiff Dimitritza H Toromanova. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (JM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Dimitritza H Toromanova. Replies due by 10/4/2018. (JM)
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to #23 Response by Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Hightower, Victoria)
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Non-Consent to Magistrate Reference by Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #20 Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
September 13, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Roosevelt Management Company LLC for Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC added. (Hightower, Victoria)
September 13, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/13/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #19 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 13, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #19 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Hightower, Victoria)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. Responses due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hightower, Victoria)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 WITHDRAWAL of #15 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Hightower, Victoria)
September 10, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #15 Motion to Dismiss,,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #15 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Hightower, Victoria)
September 7, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendants First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hightower, Victoria) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #13 Errata by Plaintiff Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 ERRATA to #5 Declaration by Defendant First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC. (Wood, Brittany)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #9 Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 Declaration by Plaintiff Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dimitritza H Toromanova that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (JM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dimitritza H Toromanova re #2 Summons Issued. First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (JM)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Pendency of Action by Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent First American Title Insurance Company, Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC added. (Wood, Brittany)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint by Defendant First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC. (Wood, Brittany)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/10/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400) by Dimitritza H Toromanova. Proof of service due by 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt No. NVLAS058629) (MR)
August 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toromanova v. First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitritza H Toromanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC
Represented By: R. Samuel Ehlers
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Represented By: Victoria Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: R. Samuel Ehlers
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Victoria Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?