Aguilar-Bamaca v. Curry et al

Petitioner: Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca
Respondent: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Nikita Curry, Alex M Azar, II, Kristjen Nielsen and Kirstjen Nielson
Case Number: 2:2018cv01486
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Respondents Alex M Azar, II, Nikita Curry, Kirstjen Nielson, Jefferson B. Sessions, III. (Fabian, Sarah)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/7/2018 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo; Pla Counsel: Brian Ramsey; Def Counsel: Sarah Fabian (telephonically) and Mark Woolf for Lindsy Roberts; Court Reporter: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 8:45 a.m. - 8:55 a.m. ; Courtroom: 6D; The Court makes preliminary remarks and inquires the status of the reunification of the petitioner and her minor child. Ms. Fabian gives a brief status of the current reunification process. Based on the representations made by counsel, the temporary stay of deportation will expire today at 5:00 p.m. Ms. Fabian is instructed to file a status report once the reunification process is complete. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Respondents Alex M Azar, II, Nikita Curry, Kirstjen Nielson, Jefferson B. Sessions, III. (Roberts, Lindsy)
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 Amended Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Ramsey, Brian) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/10/2018 per chambers) (DC).
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 First AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca. No changes to parties. (Ramsey, Brian)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY STAY. See order for details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 8/31/2018 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo; Pla Counsel: Brian Ramsey; Def Counsel: Sarah Fabian and Troy Flake; Court Reporter: Amber McClane; Time of Hearing: 9:02 a.m. - 9:46 a.m.; Courtroom: 6D; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel on Petitioner's emergency request of stay of deportation #1 . Based on representations of counsel, IT IS ORDERED that the temporary stay of deportation is EXTENDED and will expire at 5:00 p.m. on Friday, September 7, 2018, or further order of the Court. Mr. Ramsey is directed to file a redacted copy of #1 petition and #5 emergency motion for preliminary injunction. The Government is directed to file a status report by close of business on September 5, 2018. IT IS ORDERED that the parties appear for a status hearing on 9/7/2018 at 08:45 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Ms. Fabian may appear telephonically for this hearing and is instructed to call 888-808-6929, enter the access code 2178469 and remain on the line until the Courtroom Administrator joins the call. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line.Court adjourns. (separate written order to follow) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondents Alex M Azar, II, Nikita Curry, Kristjen Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III. (Roberts, Lindsy) Modified on 8/30/2018 (TR).
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that #8 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents have until August 29, 2018, to file their response to the Emergency Motion [ECF No. #1 ];FURTHER ORDERED that the temporary stay of deportation [ECF No. #6 ] is EXTENDED for one week and will expire at 5:00 p.m. PST on August 31, 2018, or further order of this court;FURTHER ORDERED that Aguilar-Bamaca's original emergency request [ECF No. #1 ] will be heard at 9:00 a.m. PST on August 31, 2018, in courtroom 6D of the Lloyd D. George Courthouse at 333 S. Las Vegas Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89101. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #3 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondents Alex M Azar, II, Nikita Curry, Kristjen Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III. (Roberts, Lindsy)
August 19, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,, by Petitioner Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca. (Ramsey, Brian)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that #5 Emergency Motion is GRANTED in part. Aguilar-Bamaca's deportation is temporarily STAYED until 5:00 p.m. PST on August 24, 2018, or further order of this court.FURTHER ORDERED that Aguilar-Bamaca's original emergency request [ECF No. #1 ] will be heard at 9:00 a.m. PST on August 24, 2018, in courtroom 6D of the Lloyd D. George Courthouse at 333 S. Las Vegas Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89101.FURTHER ORDERED that Aguilar-Bamaca must IMMEDIATELY SERVE a copy of this order on all respondents. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca. Responses due by 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Communication with ICE ERO)(Ramsey, Brian)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Order, by Petitioner Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca. (Ramsey, Brian)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Government must FILE a response to Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca's emergency request for a stay of deportation [ECF No. #1 ] by August 22, 2018. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's counsel must immediately SERVE on the respondents a copy of this order via certified mail AND by e-mail if petitioner's counsel has the e-mail address for any of the respondents. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca. (Ramsey, Brian)
August 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MMM)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0978-5190985) by Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca. (Ramsey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar-Bamaca v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Represented By: Lindsy Michele Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nikita Curry
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Represented By: Lindsy Michele Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Represented By: Lindsy Michele Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kristjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielson
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Represented By: Lindsy Michele Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olivia Aguilar-Bamaca
Represented By: Brian J Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?