Amarin Pharma, Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited and Amarin Pharma, Inc.
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01596
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - The joint stipulation regarding agreement to be bound by judgment in related ANDA litigation (ECF No. #23 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/19/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/19/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Clerk directed to transfer Case No. 2:18-cv-01596-RFB-NJK to District Judge Miranda M. Du. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-01596-MMD-NJK. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Kennedy and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/15/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Agreement to Be Bound by Judgment in Related Anda Litigation by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Smith, Jason)
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael N. Kennedy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5276230) by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Ritland Sonnenschein and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas Santoro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alaina Marie Whitt and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas Santoro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan Patricia Keane and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas Santoro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission for Christopher N. Sipes to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Einar Stole and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas Santoro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Eric R. Sonnenschein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5273817) by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alaina M. Whitt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5273813) by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Megan P. Keane and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5273810) by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher N. Sipes and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5273808) by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Einar Stole and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5273799) by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re 6 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Smith, Jason)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited re #5 Summons Issued, #8 Request for Waiver of Service. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/3/2018. (Santoro, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited re #7 Request for Waiver of Service, #5 Summons Issued. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/3/2018. (Santoro, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. on 9/4/18 by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. on 9/4/18 by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Santoro, Nicholas)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher N. Sipes, Einar Stole, Michael N. Kennedy, Megan P. Keane, Eric R. Sonnenschein, Alaina M. Whitt to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/8/2018. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M) (MMM)
August 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MMM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:16-cv-02525-MMD-NJK; 2:16-cv-02562-MMD-NJK by Plaintiffs Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Smith, Jason)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amarin Corporation plc for Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited added. (Smith, Jason)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5212155) by Amarin Pharma, Inc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. Proof of service due by 11/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Smith, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amarin Pharma, Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Represented By: Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Alaina Marie Whitt
Represented By: Eric Ritland Sonnenschein
Represented By: Christopher Neil Sipes
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Represented By: Megan Patricia Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Alaina Marie Whitt
Represented By: Eric Ritland Sonnenschein
Represented By: Christopher Neil Sipes
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Represented By: Megan Patricia Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?