Busey v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Rosanne Busey
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01612
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Unum Life Insurance Company of America that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Unum Group, Other Affiliate Roseanne Busey for Unum Life Insurance Company of America added. (Martin, Anna)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/2/2018.(Martin, Anna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation; Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer due 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Martin, Anna)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation; Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer due 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 Joint STIPULATION For Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Martin, Anna)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosanne Busey. Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rosanne Busey. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gutierrez, Joseph)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (JM)
August 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5215026) by Rosanne Busey. Proof of service due by 11/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Clough, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busey v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanne Busey
Represented By: Stephen G. Clough
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anna M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?