Razaghi v. Razaghi Development Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Kory Razaghi
Defendant: Razaghi Development Company, LLC, Razaghi Healthcare, LLC (Arizona), Ahmad Razaghi, Manuel Morgan, Razaghi Healthcare, LLC and Morgan & Razaghi Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01622
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Razaghi Healthcare, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Williams, Paul)
October 26, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Certificate of Service, #18 Affidavit, #31 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Razaghi Healthcare, LLC, Razaghi Healthcare, LLC (Arizona). Responses due by 11/9/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (Williams, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 25, 2018 Filing 50 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint re: #1 Petition for Removal; filed filed by Razaghi Development Company, LLC.(Connolly, Donna)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Extend Time; Razaghi Healthcare, LLC (Arizona) answer due 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 19, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Razaghi Healthcare, LLC (Arizona). There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Williams, Paul)
October 19, 2018 Filing 47 UNOPPOSED FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to Amended Complaint re #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL, by Defendant Razaghi Healthcare, LLC (Arizona). (Williams, Paul)
October 17, 2018 Filing 46 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time re Amended Complaint contained in #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL, filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
October 17, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Service by Publication, filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. Responses due by 10/31/2018. (Lee, Jonathan) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by Attorney Jonathan B. Lee. Court corrected entry in accordance with the Local Rules on 10/17/2018 (RFJ).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying #27 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Document; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 11, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to #27 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal as to First Amended Complaint filed by Razaghi Development Company, LLC.(Williams, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 Verified Petition for Permission for Donna M. Connolly to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul C. Williams. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/9/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 9, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Seal #38 Declaration by Defendants Ahmad Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Williams, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION re #37 Response by Defendants Ahmad Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Errata 5) (Williams, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #27 Motion for Reconsideration by Defendants Ahmad Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 10/16/2018. (Williams, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Donna M. Connolly and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul C. Williams (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5270801) by Defendants Ahmad Razaghi, Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Williams, Paul)
October 5, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (JM)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #33 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/1/2019. Motions due by 5/3/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 4, 2018 Filing 33 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi [Special Scheduling Review Requested] (Lee, Jonathan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/4/2018. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Kory Razaghi's #27 Emergency Motion for Reconsideration. For good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the response to the Motion is due on October 9, 2018, and the reply is due no later than October 11, 2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LT)
October 4, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kory Razaghi re #11 Summons Issued. Razaghi Healthcare, LLC served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Lee, Jonathan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kory Razaghi re #11 Summons Issued. (Lee, Jonathan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Motion for Leave to File as to #23 Ex Parte Document; filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #24 ORDER; filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. Responses due by 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Order, #2 Exhibit B State Court Motion to Sequester) (Lee, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Substitute Attorney Dennis L. Kennedy, Paul C. Williams. Anthony L. Martin, Thomas S. Stewart Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/1/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Substitute Attorney Dennis L. Kennedy, Paul C. Williams. Attorney Anthony L. Martin and Thomas S. Stewart terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/1/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying #22 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal Plaintiff's Motion, (ECF No. #22 ). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 28, 2018 Filing 23 EX PARTE DOCUMENT to #22 Ex Parte Motion, by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Lee, Jonathan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 22 Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order for Defendants to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue or Why the Funds Should Not Be Sequestered by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Dennis L. Kennedy in for Attorney Thomas Scott Stewart by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Kennedy, Dennis)
September 27, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Dennis L. Kennedy in for Attorney Anthony L. Martin by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Kennedy, Dennis)
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT (Plaintiffs) by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kory Razaghi re #6 Proposed Summons to be issued. Ahmad Razaghi waiver sent on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Petition for Removal* in this action was filed on* 8/28/2018.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Ahmad Razaghi, Manuel Morgan, Morgan & Razaghi Healthcare, LLC, Razaghi Healthcare, LLC.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 10/24/2018. (DKJ)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Statement in Removal Case by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Stewart, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #13 Statement in Removal Case. Document reflects an incorrect case number on the caption page. Attorney Thomas Stewart advised to correct the discrepancy and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to #13 Statement in Removal Case. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 View #15 corrected image re STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Razaghi Development Company, LLC. (Stewart, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 (DKJ).
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Manuel Morgan, Morgan & Razaghi Healthcare, LLC, Ahmad Razaghi, Razaghi Healthcare, LLC. (JM)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kory Razaghi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lee, Jonathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Kory Razaghi. (Lee, Jonathan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, contained in #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/19/2018.(Stewart, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Razaghi Development Company, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Anthony)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/28/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/12/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 28, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-18-776437-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5217791) by Razaghi Development Company, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Documents Filed and Served in State Court)(Martin, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razaghi v. Razaghi Development Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razaghi Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Donna Connolly
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razaghi Healthcare, LLC (Arizona)
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Represented By: Donna Connolly
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Razaghi
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Represented By: Donna Connolly
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razaghi Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan & Razaghi Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory Razaghi
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Represented By: Phillip S. Aurbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?