MTC Financial Inc v. Juarez et al
Plaintiff: MTC Financial Inc
Defendant: Andrea Juarez, Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc. and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01638
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrea Juarez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Geist, Russel)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant Andrea D. Juarez's ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, , COUNTERCLAIM against MTC Financial Inc, Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc., United States of America by Andrea Juarez. filed by Andrea Juarez.(Geist, Russel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal, #4 Statement in Removal Case, #2 Minute Order Removal Case, #3 Answer to Petition for Removal, by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United States of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2018.(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/29/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 29, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-778902-C3, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTC Financial Inc v. Juarez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Juarez
Represented By: Russel Geist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander E. Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTC Financial Inc
Represented By: Nathan F Smith
Represented By: Christine A Roberts
Represented By: Nathan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?