Claridge v. I-Flow Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Q Claridge
Defendant: DJO, LLC, I-Flow, LLC, Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation, DJO Incorporated and I-Flow Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01654
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Party DJO Incorporated and DJO, LLC terminated without prejudice per #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SLD)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; filed by Plaintiff Ryan Q Claridge. (Eschweiler, Corey)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales Corporation's answer due 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendants Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation. (Cools, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colin P. King and approving Attorney Corey M. Eschweiler as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/19/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Colin P. King and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Corey M. Eschweiler (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5240288) by Plaintiff Ryan Q Claridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Eschweiler, Corey)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ryan Q Claridge. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons 1-Flow LLC, #2 Summons Summons Stryker Corp, #3 Summons Summons Stryker Sales, #4 Summons Summons DJO LLC, #5 Summons Summons DJO Inc.)(Eschweiler, Corey)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re Summons contained within #1 . Summons not issued due to attorney's information not listed pursuant to FRCP 4C. Attorney is advised to download and complete updated "AO 440 (Rev. 6/12) Summons in a Civil Action" form from Court's Website www.nvd.uscourts.gov in accordance with FRCP 4C and refile using "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event. (no image attached) (TR)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Colin P. King to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/15/2018. (no image attached) (TR)
August 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ryan Q Claridge. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Eschweiler, Corey)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5222497) by Ryan Q Claridge. Proof of service due by 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons I-Flow Corp, #3 Summons Summons I-Flow, LLC, #4 Summons Summons DJO, LLC, #5 Summons Summons DJO Inc., #6 Summons Summons Stryker Corp.)(Eschweiler, Corey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claridge v. I-Flow Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Flow, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Joshua D Cools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Represented By: Joshua D Cools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Q Claridge
Represented By: Corey M Eschweiler
Represented By: Colin P. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?