Bullock v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bruce D Bullock
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv01679
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff's #4 Amended Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. Second Amended Complaint deadline: 11/16/2018. If a Second Amended Complaint is filed the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue Summons on the Second Amended Complaint. The Court will issue a Screening Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Bruce D Bullock. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 12/23/2018.(SLD)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Complaint deadline: 10/11/2018. If an amended complaint is later filed, the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue summons on the amended complaint. The Court will issue a screening order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bruce D Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SLD)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce D Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?