Music Tribe Commercial nv et al v. Auratone LLC
Plaintiff: Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD and Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc.
Defendant: Auratone LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01682
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Auratone LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rounds, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/10/2018.), COUNTERCLAIM against Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD by Auratone LLC. filed by Auratone LLC.(Rounds, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation; Auratone LLC answer due 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 Amended STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond re #13 Stipulation, #1 Complaint, by Defendant Auratone LLC. (Reilly, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to Respond Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Auratone LLC. (Reilly, Patrick)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation; Auratone LLC answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Loletta Darden to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/2/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #9 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD. (Krieger, John) Modified docket entry relationship on 9/18/2018 (DKJ).
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Auratone LLC served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Krieger, John)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission for E. Russell Tarleton to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel John L. Krieger. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/7/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Auratone LLC. (JM)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiffs Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD. (Krieger, John)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by E. Russell Tarleton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John L. Krieger (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5229409) by Plaintiffs Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD. (Krieger, John)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc. C. Levy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John L. Krieger (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5229403) by Plaintiffs Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD. (Krieger, John)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel E. Russell Tarleton, Marc Levy to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/19/2018. (no image attached) (JM)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (JM)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5225682) by Music Tribe Commercial nv, Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD. Proof of service due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krieger, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Music Tribe Commercial nv et al v. Auratone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music Tribe Global Brands, LTD
Represented By: E. Russell Tarleton
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Marc Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music Tribe Commercial NV, Inc.
Represented By: E. Russell Tarleton
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Marc Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auratone LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Loletta Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?