Kulewosi v. U.S. Consul General (Ghana) et al
Plaintiff: Hilda Kulewosi
Defendant: District Director, Las Vegas Office, Department of Homeland, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Consul General (Ghana), Jeff Sessions, District Director, Las Vegas Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and U.S. Consul General (Ghana)
Case Number: 2:2018cv01684
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hilda Kulewosi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zee, Tappan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Writ of Mandamus. (SLD)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5226388) by Hilda Kulewosi. Proof of service due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Zee, Tappan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified to change docket text to Writ of Mandamus on 9/5/2018 (SLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kulewosi v. U.S. Consul General (Ghana) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, Las Vegas Office, Department of Homeland, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consul General (Ghana)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, Las Vegas Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Consul General (Ghana)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Kulewosi
Represented By: Tappan Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?