Shull Jr v. The University of Queensland et al

Plaintiff: Frederick H Shull Jr
Defendant: US Department of Education, Geoff McColl, The University of Queensland, Ochsner Medical Group and Leonardo Seoane
Case Number: 2:2018cv01781
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 Pre-Complaint Docket by Frederick H Shull Jr re #14 Summons Issued, #15 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 docket sheet)(MMM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 Request/Petition for Bill of Discovery by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. Responses due by 11/19/2018. (MMM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM Regarding Count 1 to #15 Complaint by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (MMM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 15 COMPLAINT against Geoff McColl, Ochsner Medical Group, Leonardo Seoane, The University of Queensland, US Department of Education (Filing fee $400 - paid) by Frederick H Shull Jr. Proof of service due by 2/3/2019.(MMM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Geoff McColl, Ochsner Medical Group, Leonardo Seoane, The University of Queensland, US Department of Education. (MMM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance by Frederick H Shull Jr. (MMM)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE re Second Attempt to File Complaint by Frederick H Shull Jr. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons) (MMM)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Court Order of October 4, 2018 by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (MMM)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 ADDENDUM to #8 Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Equitable Relief by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (MR)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that #6 Request for Permission to File, Receive, and Serve Documents Electronically in this Case is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus and Equitable Relief by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (MMM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as moot. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Permission to File, Receive, and Serve Documents Electronically in this Case by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (MMM)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400.00, receipt number NVLAS059363 (MMM)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Court Order dated 17 September 2018, by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (MMM)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that plaintiff Frederick Shull shall immediately file an amended IFP motion, attaching to it a proposed complaint. If the IFP motion is granted, Shull shall serve on the defendants all papers filed in this case, including this order. Shull shall file a certificate confirming service of those documents on the defendants. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MMM)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (Attachments: #1 Motion for TRO, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MMM)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shull Jr v. The University of Queensland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick H Shull Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoff McColl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Queensland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochsner Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo Seoane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?