Skinner v. Newmont Mining Corporation, et al. et al

Plaintiff: Kirk Skinner
Defendant: Newmont Ventures Ltd, Newmont Gold Company, Newmont Mining Corporation, et al. and Newmont USA Limited
Case Number: 2:2018cv01787
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Kent J Dawson
1 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #4 Motion to Dismiss,, #5 Motion to Change Venue by Plaintiff Kirk Skinner. (Balaban, Michael)
October 25, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER that the Court defers setting an early neutral evaluation at this time given the pending #5 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 24, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Newmont Gold Company, Newmont Mining Corporation, et al., Newmont USA Limited, Newmont Ventures Ltd. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lane, Dora)
October 24, 2018 5 MOTION for Intradistrict Transfer Responses due by 11/7/2018. (Lane, Dora)
October 24, 2018 4 First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Newmont Gold Company, Newmont Mining Corporation, et al., Newmont USA Limited, Newmont Ventures Ltd. Responses due by 11/7/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Lane, Dora) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 14, 2018 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM)
September 14, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5241975) by Kirk Skinner. Proof of service due by 12/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner v. Newmont Mining Corporation, et al. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Skinner
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmont Ventures Ltd
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Represented By: Susan M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmont Gold Company
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Represented By: Susan M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmont Mining Corporation, et al.
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Represented By: Susan M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmont USA Limited
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Represented By: Susan M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?