Gazlay v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Steven Christopher Gazlay
Defendant: Adam Endel, Michael Keeler, Christopher P Dericco, Susan Jackson and Tony Corda
Case Number: 2:2018cv01788
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
1 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Steven Christopher Gazlay. (ADR)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Tony Corda re #4 Summons Issued. (ADR)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Michael Keeler re #4 Summons Issued. (ADR)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Summons Issued. (ADR)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ADR)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400, receipt number NVLAS059289 (ADR)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gazlay v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Endel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher P Dericco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Corda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Christopher Gazlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?