Kornberg v. Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Melvin I. Kornberg
Defendant: Trans Union LLC and Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01789
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
1 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 11 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Melvin I. Kornberg (Hernandez, Kevin)
October 29, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Revzin, Jason)
October 29, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Revzin, Jason)
October 9, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Santander Consumer USA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Banco Santander, S.A. for Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc. added. (Jorgensen, J)
October 9, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/23/2018.(Jorgensen, J) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 3, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER Granting #5 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC's answer due 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 2, 2018 5 FIRST Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Revzin, Jason)
October 2, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Revzin, Jason)
September 17, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Melvin I. Kornberg. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin)
September 14, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5242151) by Melvin I. Kornberg. Proof of service due by 12/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Trans Union LLC, #3 Proposed Order Santander Consumer USA, Inc.)(Hernandez, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kornberg v. Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin I. Kornberg
Represented By: Kevin L. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?