Lasko et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Silvia Regina Lasko, Imam Keith Alan Lasko, Mosque of the Golden Rule and Worldwide Ministries of Islam
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Bank of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Joe Anderson, HSBC, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Ocwen Financial Corp. and Countrywide Home Loans
Case Number: 2:2018cv01802
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 60 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 11/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Def Counsel: Jacob Bundick, Maximilien Fetaz, William Habdas and Holly Priest; Recording start and end times: 2:06 - 2:41; Courtroom: 3D; The plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko is present. The court canvasses and hears representations from the parties. ORDERED that Mr. Lasko will have until 12/17/18 to hire counsel for Mosque of the Golden Rule and Worldwide Ministries of Islam and have counsel make an appearance for these plaintiffs. FURTHER ORDERED Mr. Lasko will have until 12/17/18 to provide proof that plaintiff Countrywide Home Loans has been served. FURTHER ORDERED motions for entry of clerk's default #24 , #31 and #33 are DENIED. Motion for entry of clerk's default #34 is DENIED without prejudice. Motion for sanctions #23 , #49 and #52 are DENIED. Motions to strike #30 and #51 are DENIED. Motion for default judgment #48 is DENIED. The briefing on Motion for Declaratory Judgment #50 will go forward and defendant requests a continuance to file a response, there being no objection from plaintiff, response will be due by 11/27/18. Motions to strike #28 , #36 , #37 and #57 are DENIED as moot. Discovery in this case is STAYED and a status check hearing is set for August 19, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3D. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
November 16, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Default Judgment against Caliber Home Loans Inc. by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. (JM)
November 16, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Default Judgment against Countrywide Home Loans by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. (JM)
November 14, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Strike #48 Motion for Default Judgment by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. Responses due by 11/28/2018. (Zorio, Arthur)
November 14, 2018 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #55 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to file ONLY the "Motion to Strike" in ECF No. #55 to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. DO NOT REFILE THE RESPONSE. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 14, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #48 Motion for Default Judgment by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. Replies due by 11/21/2018. (Zorio, Arthur)
November 14, 2018 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #52 Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. Replies due by 11/21/2018. (Zorio, Arthur)
November 13, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William S. Habdas on behalf of Defendant Bank of America. (Habdas, William)
November 9, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Sanctions against Ocwen Financial Corp. by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. Responses due by 11/23/2018. (JM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Strike Motions and Replies of HSBC by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (JM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (JM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Sanctions against Bank of America by Plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (JM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. (JM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (JM)
November 2, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Non Opposition re #28 Motion to Strike; filed by Ocwen Financial Corp. (Zorio, Arthur)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 11/16/18, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Silvia Regina Lasko and Iman Keith Alan Lasko must attend the hearing in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2018 Filing 44 SECOND JOINDER to #38 RESPONSE to #23 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendant Bank of America. (Lachman, Scott)
October 30, 2018 Filing 43 JOINDER to #4 Motion to Dismiss, #11 Motion to Dismiss, and #20 REPLY to Response to 4 Motion to Dismiss, #25 REPLY to Response to 11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant HSBC. (Hicks, Jason) Modified on 10/31/2018 (RFJ).
October 30, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance; filed by attorney Jason Hicks on behalf of Defendant HSBC. (Hicks, Jason)
October 30, 2018 Filing 41 SECOND JOINDER to #38 RESPONSE to #23 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. (Zorio, Arthur)
October 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #38 Response, by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Eighth Judicial District Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court) (Priest, Holly)
October 30, 2018 Filing 39 JOINDER to #38 RESPONSE to #23 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendant Bank of America. (Lachman, Scott)
October 29, 2018 Filing 38 VIEW Corrected Image #40 as to RESPONSE to #23 Motion for Sanctions by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Replies due by 11/5/2018. (Priest, Holly) Modified on 10/30/2018 (RFJ).
October 26, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Strike #34 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Defendant Bank of America. Responses due by 11/9/2018. (Lachman, Scott)
October 25, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Strike #31 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Responses due by 11/8/2018. (Priest, Holly)
October 24, 2018 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. (SLD)
October 24, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Defendant Countrywide Home Loans filed by Plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko. (SLD)
October 24, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Defendant HSBC by Plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko. (SLD)
October 23, 2018 Filing 32 JOINDER to #29 Motion to Strike by Defendant Bank of America. (Lachman, Scott)
October 23, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default; filed by Plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko. (MMM) .
October 23, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Imam Keith Alan Lasko, Silvia Regina Lasko. Responses due by 11/6/2018. (ADR)
October 22, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #27 Response by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Responses due by 11/5/2018. (Priest, Holly)
October 18, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike #24 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. Responses due by 11/1/2018. (Zorio, Arthur)
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko. Replies due by 10/24/2018. (JM)
October 17, 2018 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Priest, Holly)
October 17, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sean McElenney) (Zorio, Arthur)
October 15, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Ocwen Financial Corp. by Plaintiff Imam Keith Alan Lasko. (JM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Sanctions against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Bank of America, Joe Anderson, MERS by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. Responses due by 10/29/2018. (JM)
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 JOINDER to #20 Reply by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. (Zorio, Arthur)
October 11, 2018 Filing 21 JOINDER to #20 Reply by Defendant Bank of America. (Lachman, Scott)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Priest, Holly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. Replies due by 10/17/2018. (JM)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Silvia Regina Lasko. Replies due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (JM)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. (Zorio, Arthur)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lachman, Scott)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Priest, Holly)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 10/2/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #11 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ocwen Financial Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zorio, Arthur)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 JOINDER to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. (Zorio, Arthur)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Ocwen Financial Corp.. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Zorio, Arthur)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 JOINDER to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Bank of America. (Lachman, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank of America that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corp. for Bank of America added. (Lachman, Scott)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Bankcorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.; Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, L.L.C. for Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Summit Financial Corp. added. (Priest, Holly)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Maroon Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. added. (Priest, Holly)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #4 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Bank of America. (Lachman, Scott)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Joe Anderson, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Summit Financial Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment to US Bank, #3 Exhibit C - Bankruptcy Petition, #4 Exhibit D - Bankruptcy Docket) (Priest, Holly)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE re: #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL; filed by Ocwen Financial Corp.. (Zorio, Arthur)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/18/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/3/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-18-778508-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5245411) by Summit Financial Corp., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Joe Anderson, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Trustee For LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint (State), #2 Exhibit B - Summons (State), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Priest, Holly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasko et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Regina Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imam Keith Alan Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mosque of the Golden Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worldwide Ministries of Islam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Scott Robert Lachman
Represented By: William S. Habdas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Financial Corp.
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Anderson
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Jason Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corp.
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Represented By: Maximilien Fetaz
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?