American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. medina
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Defendant: Eric Medina
Case Number: 2:2018cv01834
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Eric Medina served on 10/14/2018, answer due 11/4/2018. (Dorsey, Megan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eric Medina re #4 Amended Complaint. (SLD)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Dorsey, Megan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric Medina by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Luttrell, Eileen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eric Medina re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
September 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Strategic Insurance Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate American Strategic Insurance Corp., Other Affiliate ARX Holding Corp. for American Strategic Insurance Corp. added. (Dorsey, Megan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against eric medina (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5250701) by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Proof of service due by 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dorsey, Megan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Megan K Dorsey
Represented By: Eileen C Luttrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?