Thompson v. Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Paul Thompson
Defendant: Matthew John Kehoe, Worth Group, Inc. and Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01863
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
1 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 11 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendants Matthew John Kehoe, Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc., Worth Group, Inc.. (Davidson, Michael)
October 19, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Submit to Arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/19/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 15, 2018 9 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Paul Thompson. Replies due by 10/22/2018. (Liebrader, David)
October 15, 2018 8 Featured Case STIPULATION and Order to Submit to Arbitration Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #5 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Paul Thompson. (Liebrader, David) Modified event and docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) on 10/19/2018 (DKJ).
October 8, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paul Thompson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Liebrader, David)
October 3, 2018 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Matthew John Kehoe, Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc., Worth Group, Inc.. (Davidson, Michael)
October 2, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Matthew John Kehoe, Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc., Worth Group, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Love) (Davidson, Michael)
October 2, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Matthew John Kehoe, Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc., Worth Group, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Andrew Wilshire for Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc., Worth Group, Inc. added. (Davidson, Michael)
September 26, 2018 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/26/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 25, 2018 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/10/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
September 25, 2018 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-779304-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5256241) by Matthew John Kehoe, Worth Group, Inc., Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew John Kehoe
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Michael D Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Michael D Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Coast Bullion Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Michael D Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Thompson
Represented By: David Liebrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?