Marque Motor Coach, LLC v. Prevost Car (US) Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Marque Motor Coach, LLC
Defendant: Volvo Bussar AB and Prevost Car (US) Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01880
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Marque Motor Coach, LLC. (Day, Steven)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy By Plaintiff, Marque Motor Coach, LLC by Prevost Car (US) Inc.. (Terry, Brian)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven B. Epstein for Prevost Car (US) Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian K. Terry. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/29/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Steven B. Epstein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian K. Terry (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5296917) by Defendant Prevost Car (US) Inc.. (Terry, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Volvo Bussar AB re #1 Petition for Removal. (MR)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Defendant Volvo Bussar AB by Plaintiff Marque Motor Coach, LLC. (Day, Steven)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, to Amended Complaint filed by Prevost Car (US) Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/19/2018.(Terry, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marque Motor Coach, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Day, Steven)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Prevost Car (US) Inc.. (Terry, Brian)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/28/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/13/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 28, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Prevost Car (US) Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Corporate Parent VNA Holding, Inc., A.B. Volvo added (Terry, Brian) Modified on 9/28/2018 to add corporate parents (DKJ).
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-780307-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5260652) by Prevost Car (US) Inc.. Proof of service due by 11/28/2018. (Terry, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marque Motor Coach, LLC v. Prevost Car (US) Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Bussar AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevost Car (US) Inc.
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Represented By: Steven B. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marque Motor Coach, LLC
Represented By: Steven L. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?