Callister & Associates, LLC et al v. Javlin Nine LLC

Petitioner: Callister & Associates, LLC and Matthew Q. Callister
Respondent: Javlin Nine LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01892
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: George Foley
1 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 15 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Substitute Party, #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Respondent Javlin Nine LLC. (Wirthlin, Brenoch)
November 21, 2018 14 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Substitute Party, #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Petitioners Matthew Q. Callister, Callister & Associates, LLC. Replies due by 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Bisson, Mitchell)
November 19, 2018 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Javlin Nine LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Titan Asset Purchasing, LLC for Javlin Nine LLC added. (Wirthlin, Brenoch)
November 13, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 Stipulation; Re: #7 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 13, 2018 11 THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #7 Motion to Dismiss, #1 Petition for Judicial Review, #9 Motion to Substitute Party; filed by Petitioners Matthew Q. Callister, Callister & Associates, LLC. (Bisson, Mitchell)
November 2, 2018 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 11/2/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Taelor Evans. Re: #9 MOTION to Substitute Party by Respondent Javlin Nine LLC. Motion Hearing set for Monday, December 3, 2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TE)
October 31, 2018 9 MOTION to Substitute Party by Respondent Javlin Nine LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wirthlin, Brenoch)
October 31, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding violation of the Local Rules and Attorney Action Required. Attorney Chelsie A Adams is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a), 2-1 (d) and 2-1(g). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (RFJ)
October 30, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Respondent Javlin Nine LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wirthlin, Brenoch) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 30, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER Granting #5 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Petition for Judicial Review. Respondent's response due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 29, 2018 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Respondent Javlin Nine LLC. (Wirthlin, Brenoch)
October 16, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Stipulation; Re: #1 Petition for Judicial Review. Answer due 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 15, 2018 3 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Respondent Javlin Nine LLC. (Wirthlin, Brenoch)
October 2, 2018 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/2/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 1, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
October 1, 2018 1 PETITION for Judicial Review (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5263195) by Respondent Javlin Nine LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Bisson, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callister & Associates, LLC et al v. Javlin Nine LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Callister & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell S Bisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Q. Callister
Represented By: Mitchell S Bisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Javlin Nine LLC
Represented By: Chelsie A. Adams
Represented By: Brenoch R. Wirthlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?