Evan et al v. ells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Christine Evan and George A Evan
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA, Equifax Credit Reporting Agency, CorellLogic Credco, LLC, Transunion Credit Reporting Agency and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01963
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #23 Response, #18 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Klomp, Wayne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.. Responses due by 12/20/2018. (Klomp, Wayne)
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Wells Fargo Bank N.A.'s ECF No. #18 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Christine Evan, George A Evan. Replies due by 12/11/2018. (DRM)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER approving ECF No. #21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Christi A. Lawson on behalf of CorellLogic Credco, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jacob D. Bundick. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/3/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christi A. Lawson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jacob D. Bundick (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5343242) by Defendant CorellLogic Credco, LLC. (Bundick, Jacob)
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant CorellLogic Credco, LLC. (Bundick, Jacob)
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #18 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Stipulation and Order of Dismissal) (Klomp, Wayne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to ECF No. #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Christine Evan, George A Evan. Replies due by 11/26/2018. (KW)
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to ECF No. #9 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Christine Evan, George A Evan. Replies due by 11/26/2018. (KW)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default, filed by Plaintiff Christine Evan. (KW)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Credit Reporting Agency that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Credit Reporting Agency added. (Austin, Bradley)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses filed by Equifax Credit Reporting Agency.(Austin, Bradley)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/6/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF Nos. #9 , #10 Motions to Dismiss. Oppositions due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and replies due seven 7 days after the filing of the oppositions. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CorellLogic Credco, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CoreLogic, Inc. for CorellLogic Credco, LLC added. (Bundick, Jacob)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant CorellLogic Credco, LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/20/2018. (Bundick, Jacob) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant Transunion Credit Reporting Agency. Responses due by 11/19/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/20/2018. (Revzin, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Transunion Credit Reporting Agency that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Transunion Credit Reporting Agency added. (Revzin, Jason)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Stipulation : Wells Fargo answer/response to Compalint due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.. (Perkins, Robin)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robin E Perkins on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.. (Perkins, Robin)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CorellLogic Credco, LLC, Equifax Credit Reporting Agency, Transunion Credit Reporting Agency, Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA, Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. (LH)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 PAID - Receipt No. NVLAS059770) by George A Evan, Christine Evan. Proof of service due by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Image of Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LH)
October 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evan et al v. ells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Headquarters, NA
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Kiah D. Beverly-Graham
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, Minnesota NA
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Kiah D. Beverly-Graham
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Reporting Agency
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CorellLogic Credco, LLC
Represented By: Christi A Lawson
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion Credit Reporting Agency
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Kiah D. Beverly-Graham
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?