Davis v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Teniya G. Davis
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv01968
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
1 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2018 11 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7017 3380 0000 4606 0337 re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (ADR)
October 29, 2018 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7017 3380 0000 4606 0320 re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (ADR)
October 23, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ben A. Porter on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Porter, Ben)
October 17, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Complaint. Nevada Attorney General served on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/16/2018. (ADR)
October 16, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/16/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
October 15, 2018 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT 7017 3380 0000 4606 0337 and 7017 3380 0000 4606 00320 re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (ADR)
October 15, 2018 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: USM - ADR)
October 15, 2018 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Teniya G. Davis. Proof of service due by 1/13/2019.(cc: USM - ADR)
October 15, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court file #1 -1 the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint #1 -1 by certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/15/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - ADR)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (EDS)
October 12, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Teniya G. Davis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
October 12, 2018 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Teniya G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teniya G. Davis
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Ben A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?