Tharps v. American Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tracy Tharps
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01971
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
1 Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 1/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. ENE Statements will be due on 1/21/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 19, 2018 17 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Early Neutral Evaluation Session re #15 Order setting Early Neutral Evaluation session by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Mahoney, Scott) Modified on 11/19/2018 to add docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (DKJ).
November 13, 2018 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Mahoney, Scott)
November 13, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted directly to chambers - Room 3099 - not later than 12/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 8, 2018 14 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Mahoney, Scott)
November 2, 2018 13 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Tracy Tharps. Replies due by 11/9/2018. (Gabroy, Christian)
October 30, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel E. Farrington and approving Designation of Local Counsel Scott Mahoney. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/30/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 30, 2018 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel E. Farrington and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott M. Mahoney (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5302085) by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Mahoney, Scott)
October 24, 2018 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Daniel E. Farrington to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/8/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 24, 2018 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Mahoney, Scott)
October 19, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Mahoney, Scott)
October 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kaine M. Messer on behalf of Plaintiff Tracy Tharps. (Messer, Kaine)
October 15, 2018 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/15/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
October 15, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tracy Tharps. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
October 12, 2018 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/12/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/27/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 12, 2018 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ADR)
October 12, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Airlines, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. added Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate PRIMECAP Management Company for American Airlines, Inc. added. (Mahoney, Scott) Modified on 10/12/2018 to add corporate parent (DKJ).
October 12, 2018 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-780563-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5278705) by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tharps v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Tharps
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Represented By: Daniel E Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?