Ready v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Betty J. Ready
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01982
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
1 Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Sharples, Andrew)
November 15, 2018 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2018.(Sharples, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 15, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (JM)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
October 12, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Betty J. Ready. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5279821) by Betty J. Ready. Proof of service due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ready v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J. Ready
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?