U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Miranda, et al.
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Antonia Miranda, an individual;, Carlos Miranda, an individual;, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Jennifer Uzan St. John(a.k.a. Jennifer Uzan), an individual; and, Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association, Jennifer Uzan St. John, Antonia Miranda and Carlos Miranda
Case Number: 2:2018cv02008
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #15 Motion to Dismiss, #16 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Jung, Rock)
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association. Responses due by 12/20/2018. (Lowell, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Antonia Miranda, Carlos Miranda, Jennifer Uzan St. John. Responses due by 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Beede, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #13 Stipulation : Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association answer/response to ECF No. #1 Complaint due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/28/2018) (DRM).
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association. (Lowell, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response to ECF No. #1 Complaint. Defendants Antonia Miranda, Carlos Miranda, Jennifer Uzan and St. John response/answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No.1] re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Antonia Miranda, Carlos Miranda, Jennifer Uzan St. John. (Beede, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth B Lowell on behalf of Defendant Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association. (Lowell, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowell, Elizabeth)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Antonia Miranda, #2 Jennifer Uzan St. John, #3 Sterling at Silver Springs HOA) (DRM)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Jung, Rock)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Notice of Lis Pendens (Jung, Rock)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Proposed Summons to Carlos Miranda to be Issued by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Jung, Rock)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Proposed Summons to Jennifer Uzan to be Issued by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Jung, Rock)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Proposed Summons to Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association to be Issued by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Jung, Rock)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Proposed Summons to Antonia Miranda to be Issued by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Jung, Rock)
October 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonia Miranda, an individual;, Carlos Miranda, an individual;, Jennifer Uzan St. John(a.k.a. Jennifer Uzan), an individual; and (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5286527) by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Proof of service due by 1/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #14 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties)(Jung, Rock) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Miranda, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia Miranda, an individual;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Miranda, an individual;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Uzan St. John(a.k.a. Jennifer Uzan), an individual; and
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling at Silver Springs Homeowners Association
Represented By: Chad Daniel Fuss
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Represented By: Ty M Maynarich
Represented By: Robert T Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Uzan St. John
Represented By: Michael N. Beede
Represented By: James W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia Miranda
Represented By: Michael N. Beede
Represented By: James W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Miranda
Represented By: Michael N. Beede
Represented By: James W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?