Nikkei Global Inc. v. Co-Partner Consortium et al
Plaintiff: Nikkei Global Inc.
Defendant: AJ Properties International a/k/a AJ1, Hirooka Family Office, Ltd, AJ Properties International Series 2 LLC, a/k/a AJ2, Vibrant Realty, LLC, Growth Development, LLC a/k/a Growth Construction, Phillip Ziade, Appleton Properties, LLC, Progressive Construction Inc. a/k/a Growth Construction, Growth Luxury Realty, LLC aka GLR, Jude E. Nassar, Z Leb Group, LLC, Yoshimi Hirooka, Co-Partner Consortium, Growth Luxury Homes, LLC a/k/a GLH, Growth Holdings, AJ Properties International, Growth Development, LLC, Progressive Construction Inc., Growth Luxury Homes, LLC, AJ Properties International Series 2 LLC, Growth Luxury Realty, LLC and Yoshihiro Hirooka
Case Number: 2:2018cv02013
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. AJ Properties International, AJ Properties International Series 2 LLC, Appleton Properties, LLC, Co-Partner Consortium, Growth Development, LLC, Growth Holdings, Growth Luxury Homes, LLC, Growth Luxury Realty, LLC, Jude E. Nassar, Progressive Construction Inc., Vibrant Realty, LLC, Z Leb Group, LLC and Phillip Ziade answer due 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendants AJ Properties International, AJ Properties International Series 2 LLC, Appleton Properties, LLC, Growth Development, LLC, Growth Holdings, Growth Luxury Homes, LLC, Growth Luxury Realty, LLC, Jude E. Nassar, Progressive Construction Inc., Vibrant Realty, LLC, Z Leb Group, LLC, Phillip Ziade. (Liebman, Joseph)
October 29, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Growth Luxury Realty, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 29, 2018 Filing 19 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to AJ Properties International, AJ Properties International Series 2 LLC, Appleton Properties, LLC, Growth Development, LLC, Growth Holdings, Growth Luxury Homes, LLC, Jude E. Nassar, Progressive Construction Inc., Vibrant Realty, LLC, Z Leb Group, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Yoshihiro Hirooka, Yoshimi Hirooka, Hirooka Family Office, Ltd, Phillip Ziade re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Nikkei Global Inc.. (Burris, John)
October 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nikkei Global Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Minami Yukiko for Nikkei Global Inc. added. (Burris, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5288405) by Nikkei Global Inc.. Proof of service due by 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Burris, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikkei Global Inc. v. Co-Partner Consortium et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ Properties International a/k/a AJ1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirooka Family Office, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ Properties International Series 2 LLC, a/k/a AJ2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vibrant Realty, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Development, LLC a/k/a Growth Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Ziade
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appleton Properties, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Construction Inc. a/k/a Growth Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Luxury Realty, LLC aka GLR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jude E. Nassar
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Leb Group, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoshimi Hirooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Partner Consortium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Luxury Homes, LLC a/k/a GLH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Holdings
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ Properties International
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Development, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Construction Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Luxury Homes, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ Properties International Series 2 LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Luxury Realty, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoshihiro Hirooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikkei Global Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?