Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Vegas MGT LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Vegas MGT LLC, Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates and Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02067
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates, and Vegas MGT LLC re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (KW)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Alessi & Koenig, LLC by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Klomp, Wayne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Klomp, Wayne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Vegas MGT LLC by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Klomp, Wayne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Constitutional Question by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #1 Complaint,. (Klomp, Wayne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Klomp, Wayne)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Erica Stutman is advised to review and update her user account information. (no image attached) (BLG)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. added. (Klomp, Wayne)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5299167) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Proof of service due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klomp, Wayne) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Vegas MGT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vegas MGT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Erica J Stutman
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?