De Areizaga v. New Penn Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Constanza E De Areizaga
Defendant: Resurgent Mortgage Servicing A Division Of Resurgent Capital Services Lp, New Penn Financial Llc D/B/A Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing As Servicer For The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York, As Trustee For The Certificate Holders Of Cwmbs, Inc. Chl Mortgage Pass, Bank Of America, N.A. Fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Lp, Sables, LLC, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Resurgent Mortgage Servicing, New Penn Financial LLC and Bank Of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02072
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation to Remand to State Court; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: State Court with Certified Docket - JM)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and Order to Remand by Defendants Bank Of America, N.A., New Penn Financial LLC, Resurgent Mortgage Servicing. (Powell, Tenesa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Stipulation; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before November 21, 2018, the defendants shall show cause in writing why this action should not be remanded. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may file a response on or before December 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to File Response to Second Amended Complaint re: #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Defendants Bank Of America, N.A., New Penn Financial LLC, Resurgent Mortgage Servicing. (Powell, Tenesa)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank Of America, N.A., New Penn Financial LLC, Resurgent Mortgage Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Corporate Parent Alegis Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC for Resurgent Mortgage Servicing; Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition II LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Mortgage LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Investment Corporation for New Penn Financial LLC; Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank Of America, N.A. added. (Powell, Tenesa)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/30/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 ERRATA re: COMPLAINT to #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendants Bank Of America, N.A., New Penn Financial LLC, Resurgent Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Errata D-Part 1, #2 Exhibit D-Part 2)(Powell, Tenesa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/29/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/13/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MMM)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-781351-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5299870) by Resurgent Mortgage Servicing, Bank Of America, N.A., New Penn Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Powell, Tenesa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Areizaga v. New Penn Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Mortgage Servicing A Division Of Resurgent Capital Services Lp
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial Llc D/B/A Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing As Servicer For The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York, As Trustee For The Certificate Holders Of Cwmbs, Inc. Chl Mortgage Pass
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A. Fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Lp
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sables, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial LLC
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constanza E De Areizaga
Represented By: John P. Aldrich
Represented By: Catherine Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?