Shepard et al v. Clark County School District

Plaintiff: David Shepard and Terra Shepard
Defendant: Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2018cv02084
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Redmond, Phoebe)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Clark County School District. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/11/2019.(Redmond, Phoebe) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 11, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David Shepard, Terra Shepard. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ivie, Gregory)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clark County School District re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
October 30, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clark County School District (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5303520) by David Shepard, Terra Shepard. Proof of service due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ivie, Gregory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard et al v. Clark County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Phoebe V Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shepard
Represented By: Gregory D. Ivie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Shepard
Represented By: Gregory D. Ivie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?