Miller v. 4Internet, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and 4Internet, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02097
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 4Internet, LLC. (JM)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Robert Miller. (Higbee, Mathew)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Miller that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Christopher Sadowski for Robert Miller added. (Higbee, Mathew)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 4Internet, LLC., DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5305042) by Robert Miller. Proof of service due by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Mathew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. 4Internet, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4Internet, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: Mathew K. Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?