Shuminer v OLCC Nevada Realty
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Shuminer
Defendant: OLCC Nevada Realty
Case Number: 2:2018cv02156
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation re: #11 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/22/2019. Replies due by 2/11/2019. The 1/18/19 hearing in this matter is VACATED and CONTINUED to 4/8/19 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) to Respond to re #11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shuminer. (OMara, David)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel L. Leyton and approving Designation of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/13/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel L. Leyton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5357196) by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shuminer. (OMara, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #11 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 3/8/2019 at 08:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by OLCC Nevada Realty that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Orange Lake Country Club, Inc., Corporate Parent Wilson Resort Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Orange Lake Holdings, LLP for OLCC Nevada Realty added. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant OLCC Nevada Realty. Responses due by 12/20/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B Tolling Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Letter from CMiltenberger to DLeyton, #4 Exhibit D Transmittal Enclosing Right to Sue Letter, #5 Exhibit E Declaration of Donna Hansen) (Miltenberger, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jeffrey Shuminer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (OMara, David)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than December 11, 2018. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Shuminer. OLCC Nevada Realty served on 11/15/2015, answer due 12/6/2015. (OMara, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to OLCC Nevada Realty re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shuminer. (OMara, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Jeffrey Shuminer. (OMara, David)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 -1 Proposed Summons. Summons not issued due to attorney=s information not listed pursuant to FRCP 4C. Counsel is advised to refile Summons using the appropriate "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event. (no image attached) (TR)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Daniel Leyton to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/24/2018. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MMM)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OLCC NEVADA REALTY (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5316896) by JEFFREY SHUMINER. Proof of service due by 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(OMara, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shuminer v OLCC Nevada Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLCC Nevada Realty
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Shuminer
Represented By: Daniel Leyton
Represented By: David C OMara
Represented By: Daniel Loren Leyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?