Mengesha v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Habatmu Mengesha
Defendant: Central Purchasing, LLC and Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02158
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jennifer D. McKee and Kevin R. Sutherland terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/2/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Josh Cole Aicklen in for Attorney Jennifer D. McKee by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (McKee, Jennifer)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (McKee, Jennifer)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT UNDER NOVEMBER 9, 2018 MINUTE ORDER by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (McKee, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (McKee, Jennifer)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kevin R. Sutherland to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/31/2018. (no image attached) (EDS)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/31/2018.(McKee, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Habatmu Mengesha. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Carson, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Assign Judges in Civil Case, #3 Minute Order Removal Case, #1 Petition for Removal,, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (McKee, Jennifer)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/9/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/24/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent HFT Holdings Inc. for Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. added. (McKee, Jennifer)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-783000-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5317238) by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Proof of service due by 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint & Jury Demand filed in state court, #2 Exhibit Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKee, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mengesha v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Purchasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin R. Sutherland
Represented By: Jennifer D. McKee
Represented By: Jesse N. Panoff
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Habatmu Mengesha
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Carson
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?