Webster Financial Corporation et al v. Webster Capital Finance Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Webster Bank, National Association, Webster Capital Finance, Inc. and Webster Financial Corporation
Defendant: Webster Capital Finance Inc., Fifik Jan, Fifik Private Loans, Samuel Howard and Alex Hampson
Case Number: 2:2018cv02223
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Miranda M Du
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 12 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiffs Webster Bank, National Association, Webster Capital Finance, Inc., Webster Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Podolsky, Gail)
December 17, 2018 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 , #8 . Attorney Gail E. Podolsky is advised to review and update his/her user account information. E-mail address is different on documents filed. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 1/3/2019 COMPLIED (WJ).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Serve Process by Email on Foreign Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ECF No. #9 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/13/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 11, 2018 9 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Email on Foreign Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Plaintiffs Webster Bank, National Association, Webster Capital Finance, Inc., Webster Financial Corporation. Responses due by 12/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Podolsky, Gail)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER approving ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Gail E. Podolsky on behalf of plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel David S. Kahn. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/6/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 5, 2018 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gail E. Podolsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David S. Kahn (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5347214) by Plaintiffs Webster Bank, National Association, Webster Capital Finance, Inc., Webster Financial Corporation. (Kahn, David)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 20, 2018 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gail E. Podolsky to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/4/2019. (no image attached) (ADR)
November 20, 2018 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Part 2) (ADR)
November 20, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
November 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
November 19, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Webster Bank, National Association, Webster Capital Finance, Inc., Webster Financial Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kahn, David)
November 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Fifik Private Loans, Alex Hampson, Samuel Howard, Fifik Jan, Webster Capital Finance Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5329108) by Webster Capital Finance, Inc., Webster Bank, National Association, Webster Financial Corporation. Proof of service due by 2/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Summons Alex Hampsom, #9 Summons Fifik Jan, #10 Summons Fifik Private Loans, #11 Summons Samuel Howard, #12 Summons Webster Capital Finance, Inc.)(Kahn, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster Financial Corporation et al v. Webster Capital Finance Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster Capital Finance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifik Jan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifik Private Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Bank, National Association
Represented By: David S. Kahn
Represented By: Gail E. Podolsky
Represented By: I-Che Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Capital Finance, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Kahn
Represented By: Gail E. Podolsky
Represented By: I-Che Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Financial Corporation
Represented By: David S. Kahn
Represented By: Gail E. Podolsky
Represented By: I-Che Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?