Barr-Thomas v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Julie A Barr-Thomas
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv02251
Filed: November 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Firer, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #11 . The case number is incorrectly reflected as 3:18-cv-02251-APG-VCF. The correct case number is 2:18-cv-02251-APG-VCF. Counsel is advised to correct the discrepancy and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #11 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 View #13 corrected image re NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth M Firer on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Firer, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States. (MMM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (MMM)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to US Attorney for the District of Nevada. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (MMM)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (MMM)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada and U.S. Attorney General. (MMM)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Filing fee $400 - NOT paid, ifp granted) by Julie A Barr-Thomas. Proof of service due by 2/28/2019.(MMM)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint, serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration via certified mail, and issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/26/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)
November 25, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Julie A Barr Thomas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harris, Joshua)
November 25, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Julie A Barr Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Harris, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barr-Thomas v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Elizabeth M Firer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A Barr-Thomas
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Joshua R Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?