House v. Wayne USA Co., LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Wayne House
Defendant: XIONGJUN YAN, WAYNE USA CO. LTD, WAYNE & KEN, LLC, YANG BO DUAN, Yang Bai Duan, Wayne USA Co., LTD. and Aron Duan
Case Number: 2:2018cv02290
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 NON-OPPOSITION to #18 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant Wayne & Ken, LLC. (Dotson, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue. and Response to Order to Show Cause Responses due by 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #7 Amended Complaint (Second Request). Wayne & Ken, LLC answer due 1/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 Second STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Wayne & Ken, LLC. (Dotson, Robert)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #7 Amended Complaint. Wayne & Ken, LLC answer due 1/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 SECOND STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #7 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Wayne & Ken, LLC. (Dotson, Robert)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2019. Pending before the Court is a stipulation to extend that provides no reasons for the extension sought. Docket No. 12. Accordingly, the stipulation is DENIED without prejudice. See Local Rule IA 6-1(a). IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST STIPULATION to Extend Time re #7 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Wayne & Ken, LLC. (Dotson, Robert)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than 1/18/2019, why this case should not be dismissed or transferred as being filed in an improper venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION for Alternative Service; filed by Plaintiff Wayne House. (Attachments: #1 Bayramoglu Declaration, #2 Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne House re #8 Summons Issued. Wayne & Ken, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #7 Amended Complaint. (MR)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Wayne House. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Redlined First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bayramoglu, Nihat)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint re #1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall promptly file and serve the amended complaint. See Local Rule 15-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Wayne House. (Attachments: #1 Redlined First Amended Complaint, #2 Clean First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wayne House. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/4/2018. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than December 7, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
November 30, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wayne House All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5343263) by Wayne House. Proof of service due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bayramoglu, Nihat) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 12/3/2018 to correct text to reflect correct parties complaint is against (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House v. Wayne USA Co., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XIONGJUN YAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE USA CO. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE & KEN, LLC
Represented By: Robert A Dotson
Represented By: Mead Alexander Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANG BO DUAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Bai Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne USA Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aron Duan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne House
Represented By: Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?