Dunmire v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Dunmire
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02302
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (LH)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #8 Stipulation. Discovery due by 6/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jeffrey S. Dunmire (Fox, Erik-Anthony)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. added. (Larsen, Kent)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/10/2019.(Weber, Katie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey S. Dunmire re #3 Summons Issued. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Fox, Erik-Anthony)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/6/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. (ADR)
December 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jeffrey S. Dunmire. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fox, Erik-Anthony)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5346539) by Jeffrey S. Dunmire. Proof of service due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.)(Fox, Erik-Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunmire v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Katie M. Weber
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Dunmire
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Erik-Anthony W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?