Adams et al v. Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Cook, Marcelina Castaneda, John Andrews, Margaret Adymy, Margarita Benavente, Vickie Cole-Campbell, Margaret Calavan, Susan Biegler, Maria Artiga, Henry Ayoub, Lupita Avila-Medel, Edward Benavente, James Duarte, Kenneth Burt, Yvette Adams, James Bedino, Thelma Anderson, Joyce Bakkedahl, Donald Becker and Sherrill Coleman
Defendant: McKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL INC., Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation and Sicor, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02305
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiffs Yvette Adams, Margaret Adymy, Thelma Anderson, John Andrews, Maria Artiga, Lupita Avila-Medel, Henry Ayoub, Joyce Bakkedahl, Donald Becker, James Bedino, Edward Benavente, Margarita Benavente, Susan Biegler, Kenneth Burt, Margaret Calavan, Marcelina Castaneda, Vickie Cole-Campbell, Sherrill Coleman, Nancy Cook, James Duarte. (Wetherall, Peter)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Sicor, Inc., Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc.. Replies due by 1/30/2019. (Hymanson, Philip)
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #8 the Stipulation to Extend is GRANTED as follows: The parties' briefing deadlines associated with #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss are hereby STAYED until fourteen (14) days after the Court rules upon #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. In the event the Court denies the Motion to Remand, Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of that Order's issuance. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 Statement in Removal Case by Plaintiffs Yvette Adams, Margaret Adymy, Thelma Anderson, John Andrews, Maria Artiga, Lupita Avila-Medel, Henry Ayoub, Joyce Bakkedahl, Donald Becker, James Bedino, Edward Benavente, Margarita Benavente, Susan Biegler, Kenneth Burt, Margaret Calavan, Marcelina Castaneda, Vickie Cole-Campbell, Sherrill Coleman, Nancy Cook, James Duarte. (Wetherall, Peter)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Sicor, Inc., Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc.. (Hymanson, Philip)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile the Opposition included in ECF No. #9 as a Response and be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (TR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Yvette Adams, Margaret Adymy, Thelma Anderson, John Andrews, Maria Artiga, Lupita Avila-Medel, Henry Ayoub, Joyce Bakkedahl, Donald Becker, James Bedino, Edward Benavente, Margarita Benavente, Susan Biegler, Kenneth Burt, Margaret Calavan, Marcelina Castaneda, Vickie Cole-Campbell, Sherrill Coleman, Nancy Cook, James Duarte. Responses due by 1/23/2019. (Wetherall, Peter)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) re #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Yvette Adams, Margaret Adymy, Thelma Anderson, John Andrews, Maria Artiga, Lupita Avila-Medel, Henry Ayoub, Joyce Bakkedahl, Donald Becker, James Bedino, Edward Benavente, Margarita Benavente, Susan Biegler, Kenneth Burt, Margaret Calavan, Marcelina Castaneda, Vickie Cole-Campbell, Sherrill Coleman, Nancy Cook, James Duarte. (Wetherall, Peter)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Sicor, Inc., Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc.. (Hymanson, Philip)
December 23, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yvette Adams, Margaret Adymy, Thelma Anderson, John Andrews, Maria Artiga, Lupita Avila-Medel, Henry Ayoub, Joyce Bakkedahl, Donald Becker, James Bedino, Edward Benavente, Margarita Benavente, Susan Biegler, Kenneth Burt, Margaret Calavan, Marcelina Castaneda, Vickie Cole-Campbell, Sherrill Coleman, Nancy Cook, James Duarte. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wetherall, Peter)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Baxter Healthcare Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Sicor, Inc., Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Sicor, Inc., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc.; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Sicor, Inc.; Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation for McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.; Corporate Parent Baxter International, Inc. for Baxter Healthcare Corporation added. (Hymanson, Philip)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Sicor, Inc., Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc.. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits A through M) (Hymanson, Philip)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Henry Hymanson is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (TR)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/25/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-778471-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5352965) by Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Sicor, Inc.. Proof of service due by 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hymanson, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Cook
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelina Castaneda
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrews
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Adymy
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Benavente
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Cole-Campbell
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Calavan
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Biegler
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Artiga
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Ayoub
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupita Avila-Medel
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Benavente
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Duarte
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Burt
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Adams
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bedino
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Anderson
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Bakkedahl
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Becker
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrill Coleman
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL INC.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: Henry Joseph Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Parenteral Medicines, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: Henry Joseph Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: Henry Joseph Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sicor, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Hymanson
Represented By: Henry Joseph Hymanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?