Devincent Batalona v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Columbine Devincent Batalona
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv02309
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Kramer Marriott on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued. U.S. Attorney served on 12/14/2018, answer due 2/12/2019. (SLD)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (#7017 3380 0000 4606 0078 and #7017 3380 0000 4606 0092) re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued. (SLD)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SLD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Columbine Devincent Batalona. Proof of service due by 3/12/2019.(SLD)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall file the #1 -1 Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the Summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/12/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Columbine Devincent Batalona. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Columbine Devincent Batalona. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devincent Batalona v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbine Devincent Batalona
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?