Byrd v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Gary Darnell Byrd
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Equifax Credit Information Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv02322
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
1 Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas M Wieczorek withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 8, 2019 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nicholas M. Wieczorek for Defendant Equifax Credit Information Service. (Thompson, Jeremy)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeremy J. Thompson for Equifax Credit Information Service substituted for Attorney Bradley T Austin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/7/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 4, 2019 10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeremy J. Thompson in for Attorney Bradley T. Austin by Defendant Equifax Credit Information Service. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
December 21, 2018 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Equifax Credit Information Service. (Austin, Bradley)
December 13, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint; filed by Equifax Credit Information Service. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/27/2019.(Austin, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 7, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 12/7/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/22/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 7, 2018 6 ERRATA to #4 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Austin, Bradley)
December 7, 2018 5 NOTICE of Violation of Federal Rule 28:1446 and Attorney Action Required re: #4 Petition for Removal - ERROR: Documents missing re: #4 PETITION FOR REMOVAL as required by 28:1446(a). CORRECTION: Attorney Bradley T Austin is advised to file the Complaint, Summons and Answer from the State Court case using the event Errata in accordance with Federal Rule 28:1446(a) and LR IC 2-2(c). Additionally, attorney advised to properly link newly filed Errata to #4 PETITION FOR REMOVAL, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (RFJ)
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
December 6, 2018 4 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Case Number 18A003641, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5348994) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Austin, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 6, 2018 3 CLERK'S NOTICE - Regarding violation of the Local Rules and Attorney Action required as to document #1 - Wrong event was selected. Attorney Bradley T Austin advised to refile document #1 using the correct Petition for Removal event in accordance with LR IC 2-2(c) and pay the required filing fee in accordance 28 U.S. Code 1914 (a). Document #1 terminated as filed in error. (no image attached) (RFJ)
December 6, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added. (Austin, Bradley)
December 6, 2018 1 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(c) and 28 U.S. Code 1914 (a) by attorney Bradley T Austin. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document in accordance with the local rules. NOTICE; filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Austin, Bradley) Document #1 terminated as filed in error on 12/6/2018 (RFJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Darnell Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Service
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Represented By: Nicholas M Wieczorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?