Thomas v. Churchill et al

Plaintiff: Eddie James Thomas
Defendant: Serna, Churchill, Borrowman, Weeler and Quinn
Case Number: 2:2018cv02331
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Eddie James Thomas. Address updated to Lovelock Correctional Center, 1200 Prison Road, Lovelock, NV 89419. (MMM)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eddie James Thomas. (ADR)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachments in compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that the case be dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint (ECF No. 1-1), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: ifp form w/instructions to P - MMM)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MMM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eddie James Thomas. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(MMM)
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Churchill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie James Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borrowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?