State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd, Jason Chong and Andrew Mitchell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02406
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation re: #13 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew P. Baratta and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Blum. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/7/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #15 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Jason Chong, Andrew Mitchell, Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Blum, Jonathan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wolf, Timothy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/1/2019. Re: #15 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition does not comply with LR 1A 11-2(a). Certificate of Good Standing is missing from Petition. Counsel is advised to refile Petition under event "Notice of Corrected Image" linking to #15 by February 15, 2019. Failure to comply will result in denial of Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 View corrected image #18 to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew P. Baratta and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan D. Blum, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5412341) by Defendants Jason Chong, Andrew Mitchell, Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd. (Blum, Jonathan) Modified on 2/7/2019 (TR).
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jason Chong, Andrew Mitchell, Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Blum, Jonathan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Jason Chong, Andrew Mitchell, Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd. Responses due by 2/12/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/15/2019. (Blum, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Kelley, Bruce)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Jason Chong served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Kelley, Bruce)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Andrew Mitchell served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Kelley, Bruce)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy J. Wolf and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bruce W. Kelley. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin S. McIntosh and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bruce W. Kelley. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/27/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Timothy J. Wolf and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bruce W. Kelley (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5371885) by Plaintiffs State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kelley, Bruce)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin S. McIntosh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bruce W. Kelley (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5371877) by Plaintiffs State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kelley, Bruce)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Benjamin S. McIntosh, Timothy J. Wolf to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/3/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jason Chong, Andrew Mitchell, Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
December 20, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MMM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kelley, Bruce)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5368100) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Proof of service due by 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd d/b/a Meadows Chiropractic, #3 Summons Andrew Mitchell, D.C., #4 Summons Jason Chong, D.C., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 2C, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 2D, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2E, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 2F, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 2G, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 2H)(Kelley, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Represented By: Benjamin S. McIntosh
Represented By: Bruce W. Kelley
Represented By: Justin J Zarcone
Represented By: Benjamin McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Represented By: Benjamin S. McIntosh
Represented By: Bruce W. Kelley
Represented By: Justin J Zarcone
Represented By: Benjamin McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Chiropractic, Ltd
Represented By: Andrew Baratta
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Jonathan D. Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Chong
Represented By: Andrew Baratta
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Jonathan D. Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mitchell
Represented By: Andrew Baratta
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Jonathan D. Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?