Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. et al v. Reiss et al
Plaintiff: Perry White, Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc., Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Nevada, Inc. and Gordon Allred
Defendant: Richard Dick Johnson, Norma Jean Opatik, Jan Holle, Nevada Real Estate Division, Neil Schwartz, Devin Reiss, Lee K. Barrett, Nevada Real Estate Commission and Wayne Capurro
Case Number: 2:2018cv02409
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
2 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney G. Robert Blakey and approving Attorney Dan R. Waite as Designation of Local Counsel for Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED ORDER that a hearing on Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (ECF No. #23 ) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, February 15, 2019, in Courtroom 3D. The time for all defendants to respond to plaintiffs' Complaint is stayed pending further order of the court. Individual Plaintiffs Perry White and Gordon Allred must attend this hearing in person. Corporate Plaintiffs Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. and Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Nevada, Inc. must attend in person through an officer, director or managing agent with power to bind the corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by George R. Blakey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5408843) by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Waite, Dan)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on #23 Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to File Answerto Plaintiffs' Complaint is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 2/15/19, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 25, 2019 Reset answer due 2/4/2019 re Richard Dick Johnson. (DKJ)
January 25, 2019 Filing 34 ERROR: Document filed in error. Document is terminated. NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #33 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Waite, Dan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint. Richard Dick Johnson served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Waite, Dan) Modified on 1/25/2019 to correct date served and answer due date (DKJ).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that this case is reassigned to Judge Boulware for all further proceedings. All future filings in this case shall bear Case No.: 2:18-cv-2409-RFB-VCF. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #23 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants Lee K. Barrett, Wayne Capurro, Jan Holle, Richard Dick Johnson, Nevada Real Estate Commission, Nevada Real Estate Division, Norma Jean Opatik, Devin Reiss, Neil Schwartz. (Flatley, Melissa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:16-cv-01299 by Defendants Lee K. Barrett, Wayne Capurro, Nevada Real Estate Commission, Norma Jean Opatik, Devin Reiss, Neil Schwartz. (Rakowsky, Vivienne)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #27 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler A. Theobald and approving Attorney Dan R. Waite as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/16/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Waite, Dan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tyler A. Theobald and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5394316) by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Waite, Dan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #23 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. Replies due by 1/18/2019.(Waite, Dan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Lee K. Barrett served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Melissa L. Flatley re #23 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants Lee K. Barrett, Wayne Capurro, Jan Holle, Richard Dick Johnson, Nevada Real Estate Commission, Nevada Real Estate Division, Norma Jean Opatik, Devin Reiss, Neil Schwartz. (Flatley, Melissa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Nevada Real Estate Commission, Nevada Real Estate Division. (Flatley, Melissa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Norma Jean Opatik served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Jan Holle served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Wayne Capurro served on 12/23/2018, answer due 1/13/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Neil Schwartz served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/12/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Devin Reiss served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/12/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Nevada Real Estate Division served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Nevada Real Estate Commission served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Waite, Dan)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spencer H. Reed for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan A. Fetters for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Hill for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shawn T. Richards for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Spencer H. Reed and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5375378) by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Waite, Dan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Evan A. Fetters and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5375371) by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Waite, Dan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Hill and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5375347) by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Waite, Dan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Shawn T. Richards and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dan R. Waite (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5373910) by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Waite, Dan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/27/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Evan A. Fetters, Tyler A. Theobald, Spencer H. Reed, Shawn T. Richard, Christopher S. Hill, and G. Robert Blakey to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/4/2019. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint,, #3 Notice of Corrected Image/Document by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Waite, Dan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Waite, Dan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Waite, Dan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5368916) by Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Waite, Dan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. et al v. Reiss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dick Johnson
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Jean Opatik
Represented By: Vivienne Rakowsky
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Holle
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Real Estate Division
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Schwartz
Represented By: Vivienne Rakowsky
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Reiss
Represented By: Vivienne Rakowsky
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee K. Barrett
Represented By: Vivienne Rakowsky
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Real Estate Commission
Represented By: Vivienne Rakowsky
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Capurro
Represented By: Vivienne Rakowsky
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry White
Represented By: Christopher S. Hill
Represented By: Tyler A. Theobald
Represented By: Dan R Waite
Represented By: G. Robert Blakey
Represented By: Evan A. Fetters
Represented By: Shawn T. Richards
Represented By: Spencer H. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Hill
Represented By: Tyler A. Theobald
Represented By: Dan R Waite
Represented By: G. Robert Blakey
Represented By: Evan A. Fetters
Represented By: Shawn T. Richards
Represented By: Spencer H. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Hill
Represented By: Tyler A. Theobald
Represented By: Dan R Waite
Represented By: G. Robert Blakey
Represented By: Evan A. Fetters
Represented By: Shawn T. Richards
Represented By: Spencer H. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Allred
Represented By: Christopher S. Hill
Represented By: Tyler A. Theobald
Represented By: Dan R Waite
Represented By: G. Robert Blakey
Represented By: Evan A. Fetters
Represented By: Shawn T. Richards
Represented By: Spencer H. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?