Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC v. Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC

Plaintiff: Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02410
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 47 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Order) (MR)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #45 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #43 Stipulation to Continue re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (First Request) by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing reset for 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 28, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
January 20, 2019 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 40 Motion Hearing, held on 1/18/2019, before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Court (Reporter) Transcriber: Amber McClane, AM@nvd.uscourts.gov. Recording start and end times: 9:05 a.m. - 10:13 a.m. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/20/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/20/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. The Transcript Order Form is available on the court website. After that date, the transcript may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (AMM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 42 EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (TR)
January 18, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order held on 1/18/2019 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Aaron Blazevich; Pla Counsel: Michael Rounds, Samantha Reviglio, and Peter Ajemian; Def Counsel: Daniel Saunders and Mark Hutchison with Client Representative Gerald Gardner; Time of Hearing: 9:05 a.m. - 10:13 a.m.; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Araceli Bareng; Courtroom: 7D; The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from counsel. Mr. Rounds makes arguments in favor of the #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Mr. Saunders responds. The Court will defer ruling on this motion pending a new hearing. The continuance of this hearing will allow the Defendants to have time to satisfy the Court and Plaintiff that its design (either the current design or a redesign) will not resemble the design of the Wynn Casino. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2019 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Court adjourns.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 16, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthew Maddox, #2 Declaration DeRuyter O. Butler, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 36, #5 Declaration Michael Weaver, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Declaration Samantha J. Reviglio, #11 Exhibit 41, #12 Exhibit 42) (Rounds, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/11/2019. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC's #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. For good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the reply to the Motion is due Wednesday, January 16, 2019, by 5:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court on Friday, January 18, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for oral argument on the issues raised in the #5 Motion.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KK)
January 10, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Genting Group for Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC added. (Saunders, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Daniel Saunders re #32 Response by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H) (Saunders, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of William Richardson re #32 Response by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (Saunders, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Edward Farrell re #32 Response by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (Saunders, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Paul Steelman re #32 Response by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Saunders, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Motion for TRO by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. Replies due by 1/17/2019. (Saunders, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #30 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Berlinski for Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark A. Hutchison. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/10/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John V. Berlinski and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark A. Hutchison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5387432) by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (Hutchison, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel A. Saunders for Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark A. Hutchison. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 7, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/7/2019. Re: 21 Ex Parte Application for First Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC does not articulate a basis for filing its motion to extend time to respond to the complaint on an ex parte basis, and the court cannot discern a reason for doing so under the court's local rules or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant is advised that going forward, it must not file documents on an ex parte basis except as specifically permitted by the court's local rules or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Having reviewed and considered defendant's motion, plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC's response #25 , and defendant's reply #27 , and good cause appearing under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 11, 2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to #25 Brief, re 21 EX PARTE MOTION for Extension of Time, by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (Hutchison, Mark) Modified on 1/7/2019 to add docket entry relationship (DKJ).
January 7, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #25 Brief, : Incorrect event selected by attorney. Court modified event to "Response". (no image attached) (DKJ)
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to 21 Ex Parte Motion by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. Replies due by 1/14/2019. BRIEF by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for First Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Declaration of Daniel A. Saunders; [Proposed] Order (ECF No. 21) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael D. Rounds, #2 Exhibit 1) (Rounds, Michael) Modified on 1/7/2019 to reflect correct event (DKJ).
January 3, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel A. Saunders and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark A. Hutchison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5379076) by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. (Hutchison, Mark)
January 2, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/2/2019. Pending before the Court are Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC's #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a response to the Motions is due by Thursday, January 10, 2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KK)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Daniel Saunders and John Berlinski to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/16/2019. (no image attached) (DKJ)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Motion for TRO by Defendant Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC. Replies due by 1/9/2019. (Hutchison, Mark)
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to 17 Minute Order,,, by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Motion for TRO, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rounds, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/28/2018. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC's #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b) prohibits the Court from issuing a temporary restraining order before the adverse party can be heard in opposition, unless the movant provides justification. Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1). Plaintiff has not provided any requisite justification under FRCP 65(b). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's attorney may certify in writing by January 3, 2019, the efforts made to notify the opposing party of the #5 Motion and why the Court should issue a temporary restraining order before the adverse party can be heard. See FRCP 65(b)(1)(B). Otherwise, the Court will set a response deadline to the #5 Motion upon the opposing party receiving notice of its filing.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KK)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Rounds, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-02410-GMN-CWH. (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/28/2018. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II recuses himself/herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-02410-RFB-CWH. (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/27/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #5 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Samantha Reviglio re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31, #5 Exhibit 32, #6 Exhibit 33, #7 Exhibit 34) (Rounds, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Michael Weaver re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27) (Rounds, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Matt Maddox re #5 Motion for TRO, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of DeRuyter Butler re #5 Motion for TRO, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 1/10/2019. (Rounds, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wynn Resorts, Limited for Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC added. (Rounds, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5369421) by Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Rounds, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC v. Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Peter H. Ajemian
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Matthew D Francis
Represented By: Samantha Jane Reviglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resorts World Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: John Vincent Berlinski
Represented By: Daniel A Saunders
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?