Curb Mobility, LLC v. Kaptyn, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Curb Mobility, LLC
Defendant: Kaptyn, Inc., Triad Transportation Technologies, LLC, Whittlesa Blue Cab Company and Desert Cab, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02416
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Desert Cab, Inc. and Whittlesa Blue Cab Company re ECF Nos. #12 / #13 Motions for Entry of Clerks Default. (KW)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default re #13 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, #12 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (Jamison, Joni)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION (Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(h) and 4(e)(1) allow plaintiffs to follow state law for serving a summons) re #9 Affidavit by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. Responses due by 2/26/2019. (Jamison, Joni) Modified on 2/13/2019 text added. (BLG).
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default re #11 Affidavit by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (Jamison, Joni)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default re #11 Affidavit by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (Jamison, Joni)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,SERVED as to Whittlesea Blue Cab, Co., by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 2/8/2019 text added. (BLG).
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,SERVED as to Desert Cab Inc., by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 2/8/2019 text added. (BLG).
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Due Diligence re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, UNSERVED as to Triad Transportation Technologies, LLC, by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 2/8/2019 text added.(BLG).
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Due Diligence re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, as to Kaptyn UNSERVED, by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 2/8/2019 added text. (BLG).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gloria Tsui-Yip for Curb Mobility LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gloria Tsui-Yip and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert McCoy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5370280) by Plaintiff Curb Mobility, LLC. (McCoy, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Curb Mobility, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent VeriFone, Inc., Corporate Parent Curb Intermediate Holdings II, LLC, Corporate Parent Curb Intermediate Holdings I, LLC for Curb Mobility, LLC added. (McCoy, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (ADR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5370158) by Curb Mobility, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(McCoy, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curb Mobility, LLC v. Kaptyn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaptyn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Transportation Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittlesa Blue Cab Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Cab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curb Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Gloria Tsui-Yip
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?