Perez v. Eldorado Resorts Corp.

Plaintiff: Rose Perez
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02430
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER re #11 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/22/2019. Motions due by 8/21/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp. (Silvestri, Phillip)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. Replies due by 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Sue Patton-Brown, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Richard W. Epstein) (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Rose Perez. Responses due by 2/8/2019. (Burk, Christopher)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Eldorado Resorts Corp.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/9/2019.(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 -1. Attorney Christopher Burk is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/28/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/27/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/11/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eldorado Resorts Corp. d/b/a Eldorado Development Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-779296-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5373766) by Eldorado Resorts Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Perez
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?