Martinez v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Mary Martinez
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv02440
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 1130 0001 5956 7220 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 1130 0001 5956 7213 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sharon Lahey on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Lahey, Sharon)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (MR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt(s) 7018 1130 0001 5956 7213 and 7018 1130 0001 5956 7220 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA re #4 Complaint. (MR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #4 Complaint. (cc: USM - MR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Mary Martinez. Proof of service due by 4/25/2019. (MR)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file #1 -1 the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of summons and Complaint by certified mail.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to the US Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
December 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (DKJ)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mary Martinez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mary Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Martinez
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?