Marrocco v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Dominic Marrocco and Dominic Marrocco
Defendant: EQUIINET INC., Mr. David A. Johnston and David L. Johnston
Counter Defendant: Wolfe Thompson and Claudia Perez-Alberto
Case Number: 2:2018cv02441
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of compliance with #14 Order and #37 Notice of Completion. David Johnston has complied with the requirements for electronic filing in CM/ECF. (DKJ)
February 25, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #39 Motion, #24 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. Replies due by 3/4/2019. (Thompson, Wolfe)
February 25, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #38 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. Replies due by 3/4/2019. (Thompson, Wolfe)
February 22, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Grant Defendant's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #24 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant David Johnston. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (MMM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases & Joinder [Pro Se], by Defendant David Johnston. Responses due by 3/8/2019. (MMM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of E-Access Training Completion re #14 Order, by David Johnston. (MMM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Serve Equiinet INc. via the NV Secretary of State. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/20/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #26 Response to #16 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Defendant David Johnston. (SLD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #29 Motion by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe)
February 15, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #29 Motion by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe)
February 14, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #29 Motion to Serve Equiinet Inc by Defendant David Johnston. Replies due by 2/21/2019. (MMM)
February 12, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #16 Motion to Dismiss #31 Counterclaim by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe) Modified on 2/12/2019 to add docket entry relationship (DKJ).
February 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Serve Equiinet Inc. via the Nevada Secretary of State by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. Responses due by 2/26/2019. (Thompson, Wolfe) Modified event on 2/13/2019 (DKJ).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying, without prejudice #25 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/11/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Conference by Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Defendant David Johnston. Replies due by 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - F) (MMM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Defendant David Johnston. (MMM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant David Johnston. (MMM)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that #9 Motion to Stay is DENIED and #10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion to Delay Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/28/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. Replies due by 2/4/2019. (Thompson, Wolfe)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #18 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #18 using the appropriate docket entry title "Response" and relate document to the appropriate motion it pertains to. Document #18 is terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/28/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #16 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Attorney advised to refile selecting the correct event. Document #18 is terminated. ANSWERING BRIEF by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. to Motion to Dismiss (Thompson, Wolfe)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (First Request) by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe) Modified on 1/28/2019 to correct relief requested (DC).
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. Responses due by 2/8/2019. (Thompson, Wolfe)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that #12 Defendant's Motion to Compell (sic) and #13 Motion to Show Cause are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that #8 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically is granted subject to complying with the procedures listed in this order. Notice of Compliance is due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 31 COUNTERCLAIM against Wolfe Thompson, Claudia Perez-Alberto, Dominic Marrocco by David Johnston. (MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Show Cause by Defendant David Johnston. Responses due by 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Modified on 1/22/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (MMM).)(MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Compell by Defendant David Johnston. Responses due by 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Modified on 1/22/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (MMM).) (MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/22/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #10 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant David Johnston. Responses due by 2/5/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/8/2019. (MMM) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Emergency Stay or Injunction by Defendant David Johnston. (MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Electronic Access by Defendant David Johnston. (MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance & Waiver by Defendant David Johnston. (MMM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by David Johnston. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/8/2019.(MMM) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
December 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Equiinet Inc. by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to David Johnson by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Dominic Marrocco. (Thompson, Wolfe)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5375954) by Dominic Marrocco. Proof of service due by 3/31/2019.(Thompson, Wolfe) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marrocco v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIINET INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. David A. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Dominic Marrocco
Represented By: Wolfe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Marrocco
Represented By: Wolfe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wolfe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Claudia Perez-Alberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?