Jackson et al v. Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC

Plaintiff: James Jackson and Alma Jackson
Defendant: Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00065
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC. Replies due by 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jared Saft, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Richard W. Epstein) (Silvestri, Phillip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Alma Jackson, James Jackson. : Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Alma Jackson, James Jackson. Responses due by 3/6/2019. (Burk, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER re #7 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/22/2019. Motions due by 8/21/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC (Silvestri, Phillip)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/9/2019.(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/25/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Westgate Resorts, Ltd., Corporate Parent CFI Investments, Inc., Other Affiliate Westgate Resorts, Inc., Other Affiliate David A. Siegel Irrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate Michael E. Marder for Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC added. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-780027-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5388250) by Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Flamingo Bay, LLC
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jackson
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Jackson
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?