Sanchez v. Allied Universal Security Services
Plaintiff: Jaime Raul Sanchez
Defendant: Allied Universal Security Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00088
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #3 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety. Sanchez's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Sanchez has until 4/11/19, to file an amended complaint. Sanchez must file a notice with his current address by 3/22/19. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: the form for a Pro Se Complaint for a Civil Case along with this order and a copy of #3 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation - ADR)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #6 plaintiff's motion for service is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file a notice with his current address by 3/22/19.Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Mail Returned addressed to Jaime Raul Sanchez. Envelope marked "Return to Sender- Unclaimed". (ADR)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas addressed to Jaime Raul Sanchez. Envelope marked "Return to Sender- Unclaimed". (ADR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service by US Marshals, filed by Plaintiff Jaime Raul Sanchez. Responses due by 2/27/2019.(ADR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendation, filed by Plaintiff Jaime Raul Sanchez. Response to Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2019. (ADR)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Allied Universal Security Services, filed by Jaime Raul Sanchez. (ADR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCREENING ORDER and REPORT and RECOMMENDATION. IT IS ORDERED that #1 plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court must detach and file #1 -1 plaintiff's complaint. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that plaintiff be given a deadline to amend his complaint. Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jaime Raul Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(ADR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADR).
January 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Allied Universal Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Raul Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Universal Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?