Cornell v. Berryhill, in her capacity as Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: David J. Cornell
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill, in her capacity as Commissioner, Social Security Administration and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00104
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Talbert, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #9 Amended Complaint and #11 Summons Issued. US Attorney served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (SLD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #9 Amended Complaint. (SLD)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall issue Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the Summons and #9 Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. The Clerk of Court shall also issue Summons to the Commissioner of Social Security and the Attorney General of the United States. Plaintiff shall serve the Commissioner by sending a copy of the Summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by David J. Cornell. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 5/28/2019.(Marcus, Meredith)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meredith E. Marcus for David J. Cornell and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Meredith E. Marcus and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5429932) by Plaintiff David J. Cornell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert. Admit.ILL) (Taylor, Hal)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Meredith E. Marcus to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/30/2019. (no image attached) (SLD)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by David J. Cornell. Proof of service due by 5/14/2019.(SLD)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER. Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Granted. He will not be required to pay the $400 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall FILE the Complaint but SHALL NOT issue summons. The Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 3/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David J. Cornell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/22/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
January 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (RFJ)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David J. Cornell. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons AttyGen., #4 Certificate of Service Atty.Genl, #5 Summons RCC, #6 Certificate of Service RCC, #7 Summons USAtty, #8 Certificate of Service USAtty) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornell v. Berryhill, in her capacity as Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill, in her capacity as Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Cornell
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Meredith E. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?