Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. v. Blackjack Blinds, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.
Defendant: Blackjack Blinds, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00114
Filed: January 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. re #5 Summons Issued. Blackjack Blinds, Inc. waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Schriever, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Polywood Fabrication, Inc., Other Affiliate Sunburst Shutters Las Vegas, Inc. for Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. added. (Schriever, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/23/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Blackjack Blinds, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew)
January 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
January 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. (Schriever, Matthew)
January 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blackjack Blinds, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5399479) by Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/20/2019.(Schriever, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc. v. Blackjack Blinds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackjack Blinds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunburst Shutters Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew K Schriever
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?